Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Castro Leon A. Jr., Natalie Quintero Individually And On Behalf Of Other Aggrieved Employees, Quintero Natalie, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Bae Ronald, Barnes Kevin Todd Esq., Scharrer Olivia D, against Bonduelle Fresh Americas A Business Entity Form Unknown, Ready Pac Foods Inc A Delaware Corporation, Ready Pac Foods Inc. A Delaware Corporation, Ready Pac Produce Inc., Ready Pac Produce Inc.. A California Corporation, (total of 6) See All represented by Musolino Regina A, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Peter A. Hernandez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter A. Hernandez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Declaration DECLARATION OF RONALD H. BAE; Filed by: Natalie Quintero (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION OF KEVIN T. BARNES; Filed by: Natalie Quintero (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Leon A. Castro, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Ready Pac Produce, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Leon A. Castro, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Order PROPOSED ORDER; Filed by: Natalie Quintero (Plaintiff); As to: Ready Pac Produce, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Trial Setting Conference;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Leon A. Castro, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Leon A. Castro, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Natalie Quintero (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION OF RAPHAEL A. KATRI; Filed by: Natalie Quintero (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Natalie Quintero (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Order on the Court's Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Order on the Court's Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 21, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 21, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 21, 2020Complaint
Date: December 21, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/07/2021
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 01/07/2021
Date: January 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE;)
Date: February 10, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 28, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 24, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 07, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: May 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE;)
Date: May 11, 2021Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER
Date: May 11, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST) (AMENDED)
Date: May 14, 2021Order - ORDER RE: STIPULATION RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: May 14, 2021Answer
Date: June 03, 2021Order - ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: September 27, 2021Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE : STIPULATION RE : TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: January 25, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 24, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 02, 2022Amended Complaint
Date: March 14, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RONALD H. BAE
Date: April 18, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RAPHAEL A. KATRI
Date: April 18, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KEVIN T. BARNES
Date: April 18, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 18, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 18, 2022Order - ORDER ON THE COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING
Date: May 10, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 30, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: September 12, 2022Motion for Final Approval of Settlement
Date: October 11, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ABIGAIL SHWARTZ FOR RUST CONSULTING, INC.
Date: October 25, 2022Order - ORDER ON THE COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING
Date: November 02, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT; HEARING O...)
Date: November 02, 2022Order - ORDER PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: November 03, 2022Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT
Date: November 03, 2022Complaint Filed by Natalie Quintero (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Leon A. Castro, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Leon A. Castro, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF RONALD H. BAE) Filed by Natalie Quintero (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Natalie Quintero (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Leon A. Castro, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PR...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Trial Setting Conference;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Order (PROPOSED ORDER) Filed by Natalie Quintero (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF RAPHAEL A. KATRI) Filed by Natalie Quintero (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Order (on the Court's Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st) CONSOLIDATED) Filed by Leon A. Castro, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Final Approval of Settlement; Hearing o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00Complaint - Consolidated Filed by Leon A. Castro, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Leon A. Castro, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Order (on the Court's Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by Natalie Quintero (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Natalie Quintero (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Leon A. Castro, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF KEVIN T. BARNES) Filed by Natalie Quintero (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Gregg Lander Regarding Dismissal of Class Action Allegations and Entire Action)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation Regarding Filing of First Amended Consolidated Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Order (PROPOSED ORDER)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st) CONSOLIDATED)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Order (Re: Stipulation Re: Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;))
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order re : Stipulation re : Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Order (Re: Stipulation to Continue Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order re: Stipulation Regarding Filing of First Amended Consolidated Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference;))
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF KEVIN T. BARNES)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Complaint - Consolidated
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Trial Setting Conference;) of )
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF RAPHAEL A. KATRI)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF RONALD H. BAE)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference;))
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Gregg Lander Regarding Dismissal of Class Action Allegations and Entire Action)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/07/2021)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of 01/07/2021)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.