Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Smith Vanessa, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Lotus Care Center Inc., represented by Barber John, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel S. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 03, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 03, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 03, 2020Complaint
Date: December 03, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: December 08, 2020Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: December 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...)
Date: December 09, 2020Answer
Date: February 04, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: February 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: March 10, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 17, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 23, 2021Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS
Date: March 30, 2021Order - ORDER RE: DEFENDANT LOTUS CARE CENTER, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: April 07, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: April 13, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: July 29, 2021Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: August 02, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: August 13, 2021Case Management Statement; Filed by: Vanessa Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Lotus Care Center, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Vanessa Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Lotus Care Center, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Vanessa Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Vanessa Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Vanessa Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Vanessa Smith (Plaintiff); As to: Lotus Care Center, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Lotus Care Center, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Lotus Care Center, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Vanessa Smith (Plaintiff); As to: Lotus Care Center, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: August 02, 2021Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Case Management Conf...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Vanessa Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Vanessa Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed by Lotus Care Center, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Vanessa Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Order Re: Defendant Lotus Care Center, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Lotus Care Center, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Lotus Care Center, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Lotus Care Center, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Vanessa Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Lotus Care Center, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Vanessa Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: August 13, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Lotus Care Center, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Vanessa Smith (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by Lotus Care Center, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Order (Re: Defendant Lotus Care Center, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...))
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Its Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.