Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ayoub Rosaline, against Danae Yvette, Digivision Inc., Stark Eric, represented by Gupta Ajay, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel S. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 29, 2020 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 29, 2024Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 17, 2023Complaint
Date: October 29, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: FIRST-CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00General Denial; Filed by: YVETTE DANAE (Defendant); ERIC STARK (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Default entered as to DIGIVISION, INC. On the Complaint filed by FIRST-CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY on
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: FIRST-CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: YVETTE DANAE (Defendant); ERIC STARK (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: FIRST-CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: FIRST-CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: October 29, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 29, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 29, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 29, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 30, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: November 06, 2020General Denial
Date: December 17, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 17, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 05, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 21, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 05, 2021Case Management Order
Date: February 05, 2021Separate Statement
Date: October 26, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: October 26, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: January 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)
Date: February 03, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: March 02, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: March 03, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)
Date: March 03, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: March 03, 2022Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: March 21, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: March 21, 2022Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: April 01, 2022Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: April 07, 2022Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: April 08, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by YVETTE DANAE (Defendant); ERIC STARK (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by FIRST-CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00General Denial Filed by YVETTE DANAE (Defendant); ERIC STARK (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by YVETTE DANAE (Defendant); ERIC STARK (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order) Filed by FIRST-CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by FIRST-CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by FIRST-CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Entry of Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Entry of Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by YVETTE DANAE (Defendant); ERIC STARK (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by FIRST-CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by FIRST-CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by FIRST-CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Complaint Filed by FIRST-CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Judgment (Proposed Judgment) Filed by FIRST-CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by FIRST-CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by FIRST-CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by FIRST-CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by FIRST-CITIZENS BANK & TRUST COMPANY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Judgment (Proposed Judgment)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Order (re Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: April 08, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Entry of Judgment))
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Entry of Judgment))
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Order (re Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Entry of Judgment))
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Entry of Judgment))
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Judgment (Proposed Judgment)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.