Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sturgis Leah Individually And As Trustee Of The Leah T. Sturgis Living Trustee Dating September 12 2006, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Hodges Jr. Warren O., against Kim Jae S., Ocean Sunrise Llc, represented by Nakatsu David, Nakatsu David Yoshiro, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJon R. Takasugi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 20, 2020 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Declaration of Jae S. Kim; Filed by: JAE S. KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Declaration of Jae S. Kim RE: Exhibits A-Z; Filed by: JAE S. KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Declaration of Jae S. Kim in Support of Anti-Slapp; Filed by: JAE S. KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney Fees; Filed by: JAE S. KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: JAE S. KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Ocean Sunrise, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Ocean Sunrise, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: JAE S. KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: JAE S. KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel; Filed by: JAE S. KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion); Filed by: JAE S. KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Reply TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; Filed by: Ocean Sunrise, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 11, 2023Notice of Related Case; Filed by: JAE S. KIM (Defendant); Ocean Sunrise, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: JAE S. KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Statement of the Case JOINT; Filed by: Ocean Sunrise, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: JAE S. KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Declaration in support of Attorney Fees David Y. Nakatsu; Filed by: JAE S. KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Ocean Sunrise, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Updated -- Motion for Attorney Fees: Filed By: JAE S. KIM (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Updated -- Notice of Related Case: Filed By: JAE S. KIM (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Ocean Sunrise, LLC Trial Brief; Filed by: Ocean Sunrise, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: JAE S. KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Declaration of Jae S. Kim Re: Exhibits ISO Thereof; Filed by: Ocean Sunrise, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: Ocean Sunrise, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: JAE S. KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Further Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-20T00:00:00Updated -- Motion for Sanctions: Filed By: Ocean Sunrise, LLC (Defendant); Result: Denied ; Result Date:
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: JAE S. KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JAE S. KIM (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion to Enforce Settlement; Filed by: Ocean Sunrise, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Bifurcation of Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Reply TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT; Filed by: Ocean Sunrise, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00[Defendants] [Joint] WitnessList; Filed by: Ocean Sunrise, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00[Defendants] [Joint] Exhibit List; Filed by: Ocean Sunrise, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Ocean Sunrise, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 20, 2020Complaint
Date: October 20, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAE S. KIM RE: EXHIBITS A-Z
Date: January 21, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 21, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 30, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 17, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: April 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)
Date: May 17, 2021Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: June 02, 2021Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: June 03, 2021Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: August 03, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: August 16, 2021Separate Statement
Date: August 16, 2021Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER SETTING ASIDE COURT'S VOID ORDERS
Date: September 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: October 08, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: October 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER SETTING ASIDE VO...)
Date: November 02, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES PRODUCTION
Date: November 05, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: November 05, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 05, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: January 10, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)
Date: January 14, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 01/19/2022
Date: January 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: January 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: February 14, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE NON-APPEARANCE
Date: February 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: April 19, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: June 10, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 20, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 10, 2022Trial Brief - OCEAN SUNRISE, LLC TRIAL BRIEF
Date: August 10, 2022Witness List - [DEFENDANTS] [JOINT] WITNESSLIST
Date: August 12, 2022Exhibit List - [DEFENDANTS] [JOINT] EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 12, 2022Statement of the Case - STATEMENT OF THE CASE JOINT
Date: August 16, 2022Status Report
Date: August 16, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 18, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: September 08, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 25, 2022Status Report - STATUS REPORT READINESS FOR TRIAL WITH DECLARATION OF DAVID Y. NAKATSU
Date: October 06, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]
Date: September 21, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF RULING ON FSC ON OCTOBER 14, 2022
Date: October 14, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN RESPONSE TO COURT'S OSC
Date: October 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE / TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE)
Date: October 14, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL
Date: November 15, 2022Motion for Sanctions
Date: November 16, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS DUE TO PENDING SETTLEMENT
Date: December 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: December 14, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: BIFURCATION OF TRIAL
Date: December 15, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; HEARING ON...)
Date: December 15, 2022Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: December 21, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 21, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: January 30, 2023Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: January 27, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: January 30, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT
Date: February 06, 2023Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: February 06, 2023Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: February 08, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION
Date: February 09, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME ON MOTION TO...)
Date: February 10, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: February 14, 2023Objection - OBJECTION TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: February 14, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: February 17, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION OF WARREN O. HODGES JR.
Date: February 17, 2023Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: February 21, 2023Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT
Date: February 21, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: February 27, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (BIFURCATED) 3-4 DAY ESTIMATE)
Date: March 20, 2023Notice (of Ruling Special Motion to Strike with Proof of Service)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Jae S. Kim RE: Exhibits A-Z)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Declaration (in support of Attorney Fees David Y. Nakatsu)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Jae S. Kim in Support of Anti-Slapp)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Jae S. Kim)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases))
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Motion re: (TO STRIKE PUNITIVE AND/OR EXEMPLARY DAMAGES AND PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases) of )
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Notice (ON DEMURRER WITH MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Attorney Fees)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Declaration (in Response to OSC re Non-Appearance)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order Setting Aside Vo...))
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of )
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Change of Reserved Hearing Time))
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases) of )
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases))
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Motion for Order (Setting Aside Court's Void Orders)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Change of Reserved Hearing Time) of )
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Monetary Sanctions Should not Be ...))
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel (COMPLIANCE AND FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE))
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Warren O. Hodges, Jr. in Support of Motion for Order Setting Aside Void Orders)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion to Compel Further Responses Production)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion to Compel)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings))
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Attorney Fees)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Jae S. Kim RE: Exhibits A-Z)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Jae S. Kim in Support of Anti-Slapp)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Motion re: (TO STRIKE PUNITIVE AND/OR EXEMPLARY DAMAGES AND PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice (ON DEMURRER WITH MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Jae S. Kim)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling Special Motion to Strike with Proof of Service)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Declaration (in support of Attorney Fees David Y. Nakatsu)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 04/27/2021)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases) of 05/17/2021)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases))
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Change of Reserved Hearing Time))
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel (COMPLIANCE AND FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE))
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Motion for Order (Setting Aside Court's Void Orders)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases) of 01/14/2022)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion to Compel Further Responses Production)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases))
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Warren O. Hodges, Jr. in Support of Motion for Order Setting Aside Void Orders)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion to Compel)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order Setting Aside Vo...))
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Declaration (in Response to OSC re Non-Appearance)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings))
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Monetary Sanctions Should not Be ...))
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 01/19/2022)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.