Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Chen Ying, Qu Bo, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case against A-May Investments Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Jin Hongmei Rachel, Liu Ashley, Meiao Eb-5 Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Meiao Investments Lp A California Limited Partnership, (total of 5) See All represented by Liang Jason L, Zhang Ping, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michelle Williams Court presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichelle Williams Court Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 19, 2020 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ying Chen (Plaintiff); Bo Qu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Ashley Liu (Defendant); As to: Ying Chen (Plaintiff); Bo Qu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: October 19, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 19, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 20, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 02, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 04, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: January 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 01/27/2021
Date: January 27, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/27/2021
Date: January 27, 2021Answer
Date: February 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE RELATED CASES)
Date: March 16, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Related Cases))
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of 01/27/2021)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/27/2021)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.