Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Skinner Mimi, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Alexis Andrew Laurence, Lind Kimberly, Lind Carla Elisa Kimberly, against The Skid Row Housing Trust, The Skid Row Housing Trust A California Corporation, represented by Tavlian Talar, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel S. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 01, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mimi Skinner (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Mimi Skinner (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Association of Counsel; Filed by: Mimi Skinner (Plaintiff); As to: Mimi Skinner (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: The Skid Row Housing Trust (Defendant); As to: Mimi Skinner (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Mimi Skinner (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mimi Skinner (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: The Skid Row Housing Trust (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mimi Skinner (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: The Skid Row Housing Trust, a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: The Skid Row Housing Trust (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of , Final Trial Preparation; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Mimi Skinner (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of , Joint Stipulation to Relate; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mimi Skinner (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: The Skid Row Housing Trust (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 01, 2020Complaint
Date: October 01, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 01, 2020Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court)
Date: October 09, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 15, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 21, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: October 26, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 10/30/2020
Date: October 30, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/30/2020
Date: October 30, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 25, 2020Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: December 02, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: December 04, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: January 14, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 25, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 01, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 02, 2021Answer
Date: March 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 04, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 26, 2021Case Management Order
Date: April 08, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 26, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: April 08, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 25, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 09, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 22, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: July 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: July 27, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 10, 2021Order - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF MIMI SKINNER LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 11, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: August 11, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: November 24, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of 10/30/2020)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Notice (of Association of Counsel)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/30/2020)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.