Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gordillo Kimberly, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Kanani Navid Esq., Kiwan Leona Heidi, against Hollywood Hills Women'S Medical Group Inc., Lapesarde Karen S., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Gregory Wilson Alarcon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory Wilson Alarcon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: September 25, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 25, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 25, 2020Complaint
Date: September 25, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 25, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 28, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 08, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 08, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 25, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 26, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: May 12, 2021Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: June 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: May 26, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 09, 2021Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: June 11, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 08, 2021Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: July 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: July 13, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: July 14, 2021Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: July 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AFTER FAILURE TO APPEAR TODAY)
Date: September 14, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Navid Kanani; JS Abrams Law (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Kimberly Gordillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Kimberly Gordillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Kimberly Gordillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Navid Kanani; JS Abrams Law (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continued Case Management Conference) Filed by Kimberly Gordillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Kimberly Gordillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Kimberly Gordillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Kimberly Gordillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Kimberly Gordillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Kimberly Gordillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Navid Kanani; JS Abrams Law (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Kimberly Gordillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Kimberly Gordillo (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Kimberly Gordillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Kimberly Gordillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Navid Kanani, Esq. (Attorney)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil Filed by Navid Kanani, Esq. (Attorney)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal after failure to appear today)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 07/16/2021)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.