Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Espinoza Olga, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Feghali Allen Victor, Moon Kane, Nabiev Enzo D., against K & M Meat Company Inc., represented by Hering Peter, Mcclellan Edson K., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Olga Espinoza (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Olga Espinoza (Plaintiff); As to: K & M Meat Company, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Joint Report Re: Continuance of Initial Status Conference; Filed by: Olga Espinoza (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Order Setting Initial Status Conference; Filed by: Olga Espinoza (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Complex Fees; Filed by:
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: Olga Espinoza (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: K & M Meat Company, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE OF PAGA CLAIMS
Date: September 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMIN...)
Date: September 29, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: September 29, 2021Order - ORDER GRANTING APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT AND ENTERING JUDGMENT
Date: October 08, 2021Minute Order - (AMENDED)
Date: October 08, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: October 18, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: January 05, 2022Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (PAGA))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearing on Motion for Prelimin...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Olga Espinoza (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Initial Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Order (Granting Approval of PAGA Settlement and Entering Judgment) Filed by Olga Espinoza (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by K & M Meat Company, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Olga Espinoza (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Complex Designation)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Olga Espinoza (Plaintiff)
Date: January 05, 2022Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Olga Espinoza (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Joint Report Re: Continuance of Initial Status Conference Filed by Olga Espinoza (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order) Filed by Olga Espinoza (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Notice (of Order Setting Initial Status Conference) Filed by Olga Espinoza (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st)) Filed by Olga Espinoza (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Complex Designation))
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Stipulation to Continue Initial Status Conference and Related Deadlines
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice (of Order Setting Initial Status Conference)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Joint Initial Status Conference Class Action Response Statement
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Joint Report Re: Continuance of Initial Status Conference
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (PAGA)))
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Order (Granting Approval of PAGA Settlement and Entering Judgment)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearing on Motion for Prelimin...))
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Motion re: (to Approve Settlement Agreement and Release of PAGA Claims)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.