Case Last Refreshed: 20 minutes ago
Ridinger Graham, The Estate Of Nancy Vezina, The Estate Of Nancy Vezina By And Through Its Successor-In-Interest Graham Ridinger, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Stern Glenn, against Atria Covina, Atria Management Company Llc, Atria Senior Living Inc. A California Corporation, Johnson Jen, Atria Senior Living Inc., (total of 7) See All represented by Asiryan Oksanna, Davies Ashley, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Thomas D. Long presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas D. Long Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2020 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 24, 2024Appeal - Notice of Default Issued "U1"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-01-24T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed NOA B331930; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-12-29T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed NOA "R" B331930; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-12-29T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed NOA "R1" B331930; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-12-29T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal B331930; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-10-26T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal B331930 R; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-10-26T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal B331930 R1; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-10-26T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript NOA U & U1; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-10-26T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-10-12T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal "R1"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-09T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal "R"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-09T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-07T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal "R & R1"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-10-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-07T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Graham Ridinger (Plaintiff); The Estate of Nancy Vezina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-27T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal "U1"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Graham Ridinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Graham Ridinger (Plaintiff); The Estate of Nancy Vezina (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Graham Ridinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-20T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript NOA R & R1; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-29T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal "U"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 10, 2020Complaint
Date: September 10, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 10, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 10, 2020PI General Order
Date: September 23, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 13, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: October 22, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 22, 2020Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: October 28, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: October 28, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: November 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DARK COURT AND RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARINGS.)
Date: November 12, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 08, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: December 22, 2020Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: January 07, 2021Motion to Quash
Date: January 15, 2021Separate Statement
Date: January 15, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: January 19, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT RESETTING HEARING DATE
Date: January 22, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: March 02, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: March 02, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH
Date: March 10, 2021Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH
Date: March 16, 2021Reply - REPLY REPLY DECLARATION TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH
Date: March 16, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: March 22, 2021Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING
Date: March 23, 2021Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: April 22, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: April 26, 2021Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: June 03, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: June 25, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION MEMO P&AS ISO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FAC
Date: July 09, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 09, 2021Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION
Date: July 15, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: July 21, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: July 22, 2021Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING
Date: July 22, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: July 22, 2021Answer
Date: July 30, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: August 23, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: August 26, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: August 31, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: September 07, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF GLENN STERN
Date: February 02, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 21, 2021Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)
Date: February 02, 2022Separate Statement
Date: February 02, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: February 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER SUPPLEMENTAL VERIFIED RES...)
Date: February 28, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: March 01, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 16, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: July 05, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: July 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 28, 2022Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: August 19, 2022Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: August 22, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 24, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: December 08, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT WITH EXHIBIT 1
Date: December 13, 2022Separate Statement
Date: December 20, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: December 20, 2022Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)
Date: April 27, 2023Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: May 09, 2023Proof of Personal Service Filed by Graham Ridinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Sta...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Graham Ridinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Dark Court and Rescheduling Motion Hearings.)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Graham Ridinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas For The Produ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Graham Ridinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Supplemental Verified Res...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Reassignment) Filed by Graham Ridinger (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)) of )
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANTS? REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition to Motion to quash)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Reply (To Opposition)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Opposition (Memo P&As ISO Opposition to Demurrer to FAC)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Opposition (Memo P&As ISO Opposition to Mtn to Strike Portions of FAC)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Dark Court and Rescheduling Motion Hearings.))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Doe 2 WG Covina SH, LP)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Doe 1 Atria Covina)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice (Notice Of Court Resetting Hearing Date)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Quash)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas For The Produ...))
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Successor-In-Interest Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Section 377.32)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Reply (Reply Declaration to Opposition to Motion to Quash)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Sta...))
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Dark Court and Rescheduling Motion Hearings.) of )
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Doe 3 Atria Management Company LLC.)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st))
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Glenn Stern)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Estrella Herman, CSR #13865)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-07-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Supplemental Verified Res...))
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Successor-In-Interest Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Section 377.32)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Dark Court and Rescheduling Motion Hearings.) of 11/12/2020)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Dark Court and Rescheduling Motion Hearings.))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANTS? REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)) of 01/06/2021)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice (Notice Of Court Resetting Hearing Date)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Sta...))
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Quash)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas For The Produ...))
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Reply (Reply Declaration to Opposition to Motion to Quash)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition to Motion to quash)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Doe 3 Atria Management Company LLC.)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Doe 2 WG Covina SH, LP)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Doe 1 Atria Covina)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st))
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Reply (To Opposition)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Opposition (Memo P&As ISO Opposition to Demurrer to FAC)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Glenn Stern)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Opposition (Memo P&As ISO Opposition to Mtn to Strike Portions of FAC)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Estrella Herman, CSR #13865)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Supplemental Verified Res...))
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Doe 1 Atria Covina)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition to Motion to quash)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Successor-In-Interest Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Section 377.32)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Reply (Reply Declaration to Opposition to Motion to Quash)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Doe 2 WG Covina SH, LP)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Doe 3 Atria Management Company LLC.)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.