Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Construction By De Mill Inc., Mjc Roofing Inc. A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ruiz Christopher, against Construction By De Mill Inc., Construction By Gerald Demill Inc. A California Corporation, represented by Stanton Mitchel T, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Wendy W. Y. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWendy W. Y. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2020 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: MJC Roofing, Inc. a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Construction by De Mill, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Construction by De Mill, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Construction by Gerald DeMill, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: MJC Roofing, Inc. a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: MJC Roofing, Inc. a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Construction by De Mill, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: March 15, 2023Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 08, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 08, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 08, 2020Complaint
Date: September 08, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 10, 2020Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: September 18, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: October 07, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 24, 2020Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: November 24, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 21, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 07, 2021Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL
Date: September 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL)
Date: September 03, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 25, 2022Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: February 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)
Date: February 07, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: February 08, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: February 17, 2022Notice - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND VACATE DATES
Date: February 14, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: June 02, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: June 03, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: June 15, 2022Case Management Order
Date: June 15, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: March 13, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by MJC Roofing, Inc. a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by MJC Roofing, Inc. a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by Construction by Gerald DeMill, Inc. a California corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by MJC Roofing, Inc. a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Construction by De Mill, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Construction by De Mill, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by MJC Roofing, Inc. a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for order continuing trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Answer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT) Filed by MJC Roofing, Inc. a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Construction by De Mill, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by MJC Roofing, Inc. a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: whether to order the parties to partici...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Complaint Filed by MJC Roofing, Inc. a California Corporation (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by MJC Roofing, Inc. a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Answer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for order continuing trial)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.