Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Stein Zachary, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Cole Kevin Jason, Tauler Robert, against Blackstone Labs Llc, represented by Covarrubias Mariel, Green Kristen Ariana, Johnson Kristen Ariana, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Wendy W. Y. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWendy W. Y. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2020 |
CategoryOther Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Blackstone Labs, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Blackstone Labs, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff); As to: Blackstone Labs, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Reply ISO Motion to Compel RFP Responses; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Related Case - *Dept 30 has older case*; Filed by: Blackstone Labs, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Blackstone Labs, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Blackstone Labs, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Reply ISO Motion to Compel SRog Responses; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff); As to: Blackstone Labs, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Blackstone Labs, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Response as to the Relatedness of Black Diamond and Blackstone; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Blackstone Labs, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Blackstone Labs, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Objection to Evidence; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Order granting mtn to stay; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Blackstone Labs, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Request for Court's Intervention in Discovery Dispute; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Kristen Ariana Green (Attorney)
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Declaration of Robert Tauler; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-14T00:00:00Opposition to Def.'s MSJ; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Blackstone Labs, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Blackstone Labs, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Order overruling demurrer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Blackstone Labs, LLC (Defendant); As to: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Blackstone Labs, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Order granting application re pro hac vice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Brief (BLACKSTONE LABS, LLC?S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Kevin J. Cole)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice (OF MINUTE ORDER OF COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Association of Attorney (PLAINTIFF ZACHARY STEIN?S NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Related Case (- *Dept 30 has older case*)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Order (overruling demurrer)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Application (Verified Application of Arthur W. Leach For Permission To Appear As Counsel Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (Request for Production)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Request (for Court's Intervention in Discovery Dispute)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF ZACHARY STEIN?S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Response (as to the Relatedness of Black Diamond and Blackstone)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (TO INTERROGATORIES AND FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Notice (of continuance of hearing and order)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing)
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice))
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Reply (ISO Motion to Compel SRog Responses)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF ZACHARY STEIN?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BLACKSTONE LABS, LLC?S MOTION TO STAY)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference as to the criminal case))
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Declaration (of K. Green in support of Blackstone Labs LLC's Informal Discovery Conference Statement)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Order (granting application re pro hac vice)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Order (granting mtn to stay)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice) of )
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings))
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition To Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Arthur W. Leach)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Other - (JOINT STATEMENT RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings) of )
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Reply (ISO Motion to Compel RFP Responses)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference as to the criminal case))
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings; Filed by: Blackstone Labs, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Blackstone Labs, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Continuance) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Declaration of Kevin J. Cole in response to motions to compel; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-14T00:00:00Other - JOINT STATEMENT RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES; Filed by: Blackstone Labs, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-12T00:00:00Reply in Support of Plaintiff's MSA; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Declaration of Kevin Cole; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-14T00:00:00Declaration of Kevin J. Cole; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Continuance of Hearing; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Declaration of Kevin J. Cole; Filed by: Zachary Stein (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF ZACHARY STEIN?S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Related Case (- *Dept 30 has older case*)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Association of Attorney (PLAINTIFF ZACHARY STEIN?S NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice (of continuance of hearing and order)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice (OF MINUTE ORDER OF COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Response (as to the Relatedness of Black Diamond and Blackstone)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Brief (BLACKSTONE LABS, LLC?S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Order (overruling demurrer)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Application (Verified Application of Arthur W. Leach For Permission To Appear As Counsel Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Request (for Court's Intervention in Discovery Dispute)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (Request for Production)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (TO INTERROGATORIES AND FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Reply (ISO Motion to Compel RFP Responses)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition To Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Arthur W. Leach)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Reply (ISO Motion to Compel SRog Responses)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing)
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings) of 07/12/2021)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Order (granting mtn to stay)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Order (granting application re pro hac vice)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice))
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings))
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice) of 06/18/2021)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF ZACHARY STEIN?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BLACKSTONE LABS, LLC?S MOTION TO STAY)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Other - (JOINT STATEMENT RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference as to the criminal case))
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference as to the criminal case))
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Kevin J. Cole)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.