Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Stephens J. Keith, Virtual Media Group Inc. A California Corporation, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Simmes David R., against La Outdoor Llc. A California Limited Liability Company, Levian Jamshid, Levian Javid, Levian Shokrolah, represented by Pugh Firouzeh, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaura A. Seigle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2020 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Virtual Media Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Firouzeh Pugh (Attorney)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 12, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 12, 2020Complaint
Date: August 12, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 12, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 14, 2020Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: October 30, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 25, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: December 09, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 24, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION
Date: February 03, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)
Date: February 17, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: February 18, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: June 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)
Date: August 17, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: September 30, 2021Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: October 14, 2021Opposition (NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance of Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Arbitration))
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Case Management Conf...))
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Continuance of Case Management Conference) of 12/09/2020)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.