Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company Llc. A Delaware Llc, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case represented by Hurwitz Daniel S., against Bijan Radnia As Trustee Of The Radnia Revocable Trust Dated July 1 2009, Carson-Wilmington Inc. A California Corporation, represented by Kanooni Kevin Y, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Theresa M. Traber presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management101 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2020 |
CategoryInjunctive Relief Only (Not Domestic/Harassment) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Complaint
Date: July 27, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 27, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 27, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 28, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 29, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 04, 2020Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE
Date: August 04, 2020Answer
Date: October 16, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 20, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: November 05, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: November 05, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 03, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF KENNETH P. ROBERTS RE OSC HEARING
Date: December 10, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION FURTHER DECLARATION IN ANTICIPATION
Date: December 10, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY ...)
Date: December 17, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: December 18, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 29, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 29, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO ORDER
Date: February 02, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF KENNETH P. ROBERTS RE OSC RE FAILURE TO APPEAR
Date: February 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 18, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 01, 2021Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY LLC., a Delaware LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY LLC., a Delaware LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing - Other on Defendant's ri...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY LLC., a Delaware LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY LLC., a Delaware LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Monetary ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Declaration (In Response To Order)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Kenneth P. Roberts Re OSC Re Failure to Appear)
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Declaration (Further Declaration in Anticipation)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Continuing Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Monetary ...))
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Affidavit (Affidavit of Due Diligence)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Kenneth P. Roberts Re OSC Hearing)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Continuing Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.