Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Key Sciences Llc, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Sato Peter T, against Mrs. Gooch?S Natural Foods Markets Inc. A California Corporation, Whole Foods Market California Inc. A California Corporation, Whole Foods Market Inc. A Texas Corporation, represented by Blaxter J.T. Wells, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Mark V. Mooney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark V. Mooney Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2020 |
CategoryOther Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 24, 2020Complaint
Date: July 24, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 24, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 24, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 27, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY HORN IN SUPPORT
Date: October 22, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 22, 2020Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: October 22, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 22, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: October 22, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: December 09, 2020Motion for Leave - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 09, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: December 30, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/30/2020
Date: December 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 08, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: April 16, 2021Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Whole Foods Market, Inc., a Texas corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Motion for Leave to file a First Amended Complaint; Filed by: Key Sciences LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Key Sciences LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Key Sciences LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Whole Foods Market, Inc., a Texas corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Key Sciences LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Key Sciences LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: April 16, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Key Sciences LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Whole Foods Market, Inc., a Texas corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Key Sciences LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to file a First Amended Complaint) Filed by Key Sciences LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Key Sciences LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to file a First Amended Complaint...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Key Sciences LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by Whole Foods Market, Inc., a Texas corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Key Sciences LLC (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Declaration (OF TIMOTHY HORN IN SUPPORT)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/30/2020)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to file a First Amended Complaint...))
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to file a First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.