Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Aguilar Cara On Behalf Of Herself And All Other Current And Former Aggrieved California Based Hourly Non-Exempt Employees, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Miller Courtney M., against Aguilar Cara On Behalf Of Herself And All Other Current And Former Aggrieved California Based Hourly Non-Exempt Employees, B & V Enterprises Inc. Aka Super King Markets, represented by Amaya David, Fischbein Jason, Sweiss Hannah, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Gregory Keosian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: July 24, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: June 12, 2023Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-09T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid PAID FOR APPELLANT B & V Enterprises, Inc. Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript NTR; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Statement of Decision; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 1 Volumes Certified; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-07T00:00:00Statement of Decision; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00Ruling Re: Defendant B&V Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 24, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 24, 2020Complaint
Date: July 24, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 06, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: August 06, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 14, 2020Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: August 26, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 30, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 04, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: March 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 14, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: April 26, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 30, 2021Case Management Order
Date: May 14, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/30/2021
Date: April 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: May 14, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING MEDIATION;
Date: December 02, 2021Status Report - STATUS REPORT JOINT UPDATE RE OUTCOME OF MEDIATION
Date: March 09, 2022Answer
Date: March 22, 2022Notice of Related Case
Date: June 09, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 31, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/31/2022
Date: August 31, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 06, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: September 06, 2022Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: September 06, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 15, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)
Date: September 29, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: October 03, 2022Order - RULING RE: DEFENDANT B&V ENTERPRISES, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: October 03, 2022Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: December 08, 2022Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: December 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: December 14, 2022Statement of Decision
Date: December 16, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: December 16, 2022Objection - OBJECTION TO THE COURTS DECEMBER 16, 2022 STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: December 30, 2022Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: January 30, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 06, 2023Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/06/2023
Date: March 06, 2023Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: May 09, 2023Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Statement of Decision Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00Ruling Re: Defendant B&V Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Statement of Decision) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Answer Filed by B & V Enterprises, Inc. Erroneously Sued As B & V ENTERPRISES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation and Protective Order)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/30/2021)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.