Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Anderson Michelle, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Messrelian Harout, against Simple Employment Services Inc.Doe 1, Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions Inc., Wahi Ashish, represented by Mackey Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Maurice A. Leiter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: July 17, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Michelle Anderson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Michelle Anderson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Brief PLAINTIFF'S INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE BRIEF; Filed by: Michelle Anderson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 17, 2020Complaint
Date: July 17, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 17, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 17, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 20, 2020Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: July 24, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: July 31, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: August 18, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 03, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: September 29, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 01, 2020Answer
Date: October 21, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: December 01, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 07, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: February 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: December 10, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: November 07, 2022Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFF'S INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE BRIEF
Date: November 10, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 05, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: November 15, 2022Answer
Date: December 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: February 23, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: April 20, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: April 21, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: April 28, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: April 28, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: May 01, 2023Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Michelle Anderson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Michelle Anderson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Michelle Anderson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Michelle Anderson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc. (Defendant); Ashish Wahi (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Michelle Anderson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Brief (PLAINTIFF'S INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE BRIEF) Filed by Michelle Anderson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by Simple employment services Inc.(DOE 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Michelle Anderson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Michelle Anderson (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Michelle Anderson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.