Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Twenty-One Inc. Dba Today Autogroup, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Cabanday Orlando F. Esq., against Bai Lotus, King Mark, Lc2 Usa Inc. A California Corporation, Zhang Yaijie, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Robert Broadbelt III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert Broadbelt III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2020 |
CategoryOther Contract Dispute (Not Breach/Insurance/Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
; On the Complaint filed by Twenty-One Inc. on
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Twenty-One Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Declaration ISO REQ Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Twenty-One Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Default entered as to Mark King; On the Complaint filed by Twenty-One Inc. on
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 30, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Twenty-One Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Twenty-One Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Default entered as to Yaijie Zhang; On the Complaint filed by Twenty-One Inc. on
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Twenty-One Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Default entered as to Lotus Bai; On the Complaint filed by Twenty-One Inc. on
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Non-Entry of Default; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Default Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Twenty-One Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 18, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 15, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 15, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 15, 2020Complaint
Date: July 15, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 15, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 03, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 01, 2020Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments - NOTICE OF NON-ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: September 10, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 14, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 01, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: November 23, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: December 08, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 08, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION ISO REQ ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 08, 2020Judgment - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: February 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGEMENT)
Date: February 10, 2021Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: March 18, 2021Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: March 30, 2021Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: April 01, 2021Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: December 09, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Declaration (ISO REQ Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Non-Entry of Default
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.