Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bunnell Justin, Jordan Shahen, Jordan Shant, Minas David Torosian Trustee Of The Minas David Torosian Revocable Living Trust Dated October 21 2014 Aka Minas D. Torosian Living Trust, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Goodfried Jeffrey S., against Bunnell Justin, Jordan Shahen, Jordan Shant, represented by Trauben Michael Alan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Mark V. Mooney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark V. Mooney Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management154 days |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Complaint
Date: July 14, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 14, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 14, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 14, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 15, 2020Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: July 23, 2020Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: July 23, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 13, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: December 08, 2020Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: December 10, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: December 15, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 08, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 11, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 04, 2021Answer
Date: March 09, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: March 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 10, 2021Answer - ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ANSWER
Date: April 02, 2021Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: April 02, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 20, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 20, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 26, 2021Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: May 04, 2021Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: May 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 10, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: June 07, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Minas David Torosian (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Minas David Torosian (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Minas David Torosian (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); C...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Minas David Torosian (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Minas David Torosian (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Minas David Torosian (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Shahen Jordan (Defendant); Shant Jordan (Defendant); Justin Bunnell (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Answer Filed by Shahen Jordan (Defendant); Shant Jordan (Defendant); Justin Bunnell (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW))
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF TAKING HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT OFF CALENDAR WITHOUT PREJUDICE)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Answer (First Amended Answer)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/10/2021)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.