Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hylen Lynn, Triumph Construction Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Melkonian Geoffrey, against Triumph Construction Inc., represented by Calin Sandra, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Mark H. Epstein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark H. Epstein Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 06, 2020 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Complaint; Filed by: Lynn Hylen (Plaintiff); As to: Triumph Construction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Triumph Construction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: January 10, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Triumph Construction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Lynn Hylen (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: December 08, 2022Answer; Filed by: Triumph Construction, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Lynn Hylen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Triumph Construction, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Roes 1-25 (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Lynn Hylen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Triumph Construction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Order Notice of Assignment of Cases For All Purposes; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lynn Hylen (Plaintiff); As to: Triumph Construction, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 06, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 06, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 06, 2020Complaint
Date: October 06, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 07, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: December 29, 2020Answer
Date: December 29, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: February 25, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 15, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 08, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 07, 2021Order - ORDER NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES
Date: September 15, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: September 16, 2021Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (non PI)
Date: May 27, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: December 08, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)
Date: December 08, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: January 10, 2023Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.