Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
City Of Glendora A Municipal Corporation, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Wynder William W., Wynder William Woodrow, against Bell Davante Dajon, Xin Cao Charles, Zhao Olivia Lei, represented by Li Yuan Musa, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pomona South with Peter A. Hernandez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter A. Hernandez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2020 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HousePomona South |
Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Declaration of Olivia Lei Zhao; Filed by: OLIVIA LEI ZHAO (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: As to: CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Opposition OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE; Filed by: CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Reply REPLY; Filed by: CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION; Filed by: CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter;) of , Court Orders; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Related Case Determination;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: CAO CHARLES XIN (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Request For Copies; Filed by: CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Airbnb, Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: OLIVIA LEI ZHAO (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice (AMENDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS) Filed by CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Stipulation for Judgment Filed by CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: January 19, 2021Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by OLIVIA LEI ZHAO (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Reply (REPLY) Filed by CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter;) of , Court Orders) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY) Filed by CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Complaint Filed by CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Olivia Lei Zhao) Filed by OLIVIA LEI ZHAO (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION) Filed by CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by CAO CHARLES XIN (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE) Filed by CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Airbnb, Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL) Filed by CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Related Case Determination;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS) Filed by CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Order (PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE) Filed by CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ERRATA) Filed by CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Related Case Determination;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction; Hearing on Ex...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Request For Copies Filed by CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by CITY OF GLENDORA, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Order (PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order;))
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Declaration (of Olivia Lei Zhao)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Notice (AMENDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.