Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gunn, Walter, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts with Timothy S. Healy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy S. Healy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2020 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Healy, Timothy S. |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition - After Letters Issued | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Healy, Timothy S. |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.