Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nord, Jim, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Monique S. Langhorne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMonique S. Langhorne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 19, 2020 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt BENEFICIARY RECEIPT |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt ATTORNEY FEES |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt BENEFICIARY RECEIPT |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt - EXECUTOR FEES |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Supervision Termination - Approval of final distribution | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Approving and Settling First and Final Account and Report of Executor | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing: Accounting First and Final Judge: Langhorne, Monique |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Accounting First and Final Account and Report of Executor and Petition for its Settlement; for Final Distribution; for Allowance of COmpensation for Satutory Attorney and Executor Fees; for Costs; and for Authority to Withhold a Reserve |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.