Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Berjikyan Ruzan, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Mad Dog Bail Bond Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pasadena with Beverly L. Bourne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HousePasadena |
Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: As to: Ruzan Berjikyan (Plaintiff)
Date: November 06, 2020Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 21, 2021Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 21, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 26, 2021Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: As to: Ruzan Berjikyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.