Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Freihofner, Frederic R, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts with David M. Sanders presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid M. Sanders Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 19, 2020 |
CategoryGuardianship Person Only |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Sanders, David M. |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Consent | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Duties of Guardian | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Confidential Guardian Screening Form | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended - No Fee | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for investigator fees | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Investigative Report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.