Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Trueblood, Meredith A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mueller, Rick J, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph J. Solga presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph J. Solga Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 09, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Solga, Joseph J. |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment: Default | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family) | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration: Default | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration: Income and Expense | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Request: Enter Default | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Petition (Family) | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition: Dissolution |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.