Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City Of San Jose, The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Vance Chang, against David Tsai, Yi-Chun Chen, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Peter H. Kirwan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter H. Kirwan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2020 |
CategoryOther Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort Unlimited (35) |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: September 30, 2020Order: Ex Parte
Date: October 02, 2020Hearing: OSC TRO/Preliminary Injunction
Date: November 03, 2020Request
Date: September 30, 2020Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: September 16, 2020Ex Parte Application
Date: September 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2021 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 8 |
|
November 03, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing: OSC TRO/Preliminary Injunction
Judge: Department 19 |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter Env.# 5124991; Please submit your proposed order after the hearing. See Local Rule 16B. Any proposed order submitted to the Court must contain some text of the order on the signature page. See Local Rule 10: |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Personal hrg 11-3-2020 Proof of Service |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Personal HRG 11-3- 2002 Proof of Service |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order: Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order to Abate Nuisance, and Order to Show Cause Regarding Why a Preliminary Injunction should Not be Issued: IT IS ORDER that: The application for a Temporary Restraining Order is GRANTED, the terms of which are stated below and are effective as of October 2, 2020. IT IS FURTHE ORDERED that: The request for an Order to Show Cause regarding a Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. Hearing is schedule for November 3, 2020 at 9:00am in Department 19. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Kulkarni, Dept. 8. EFS 10/2/20rb Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities Memo P&A ISO TRO-Preliminary Injunction |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request REq Judicial Ntc for TRO-Preliminary Injunction |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Decl. Messier ISO TRO-Preliminary Injunction |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.