Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Morawski, Barbara, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Pro Se, against Beaudet, Jim, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims $1501 - $5000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Reject Letter | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing Claim $1,650.00 Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Plaintiff's Claim | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Small Claims | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing Claim $1,650.00 Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Electronic Service, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.