Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Doe, Jane, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Thompson, Robert William, against Annamalai Ashokan, Monterey Pain Treatment Medical Center, Inc, Monterey Pain Treatment Medical Center, Inc., represented by Leonard, Nicholas John, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 03, 2020 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Reply
Date: March 17, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: February 18, 2021Reply
Date: March 17, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: March 24, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: May 05, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: March 11, 2021Demurrer
Date: March 24, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: March 11, 2021Notice of Reassignment
Date: January 07, 2021Complaint
Date: November 03, 2020Motion - No Fee
Date: February 18, 2021Declaration
Date: March 11, 2021Declaration
Date: March 11, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: February 18, 2021Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: February 18, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 20, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 22, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 22, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: July 07, 2021Declaration
Date: February 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendants' Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendants' Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Returned Documents | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer - No Fee | |
March 24, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
The Court finds that the Demurrer is untimely however, an untimely Demurrer may be considered by the court in its discretion. Jackson v. Doe (2011) 192 Cal.App.4th 742, 750. The Court in its discretio...
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint Motion to Strike Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.