Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Oportun Inc., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Guerrero, Rosaisela Fletes, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Schmal, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchmal, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims: >12 Claims Filed |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Evidence Hearing
Judge: Schmal, Timothy |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Small Claims | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | SC Plaintiff's Claim | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | SC Plaintiff Claim Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.