Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weinman, Linda Susan, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Maxwell, Pauline presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Misc Petition - Name Change |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Case Cycle Time73 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name, Filed | |
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Name Change
Judge: Maxwell, Pauline |
|
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication, Filed | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause for Change of Name, Filed | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name, Filed | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.