Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ramirez, Patrick, Jr., represented by Navarrete, Carlos Javier, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Michael J. Reinhart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael J. Reinhart Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedMay 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Waiver of Rights Admission of VOP, Mandatory Sup/Post Relea | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Probation Reinstated | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Request to Return Warrant | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings After Arrest re:
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant-Issued | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Report of a Violation of Probation | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 Effective 01/01/2022 | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.