Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Torres, Victor Yave, represented by Benninghoff, Melina S, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 14, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Released from custody, as to this case only | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Reinhart, Michael J |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant in Custody | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Edwards, Randy |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.