Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gealon Jesse Alaba filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Melvin D. Sandvig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelvin D. Sandvig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Case Cycle Time153 days |
Proof of Publication
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: September 02, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 09, 2020Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Decree Changing Name
Date: December 01, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: October 21, 2020Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME))
Date: October 21, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (of Order to Show Cause)
Date: October 28, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.