Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
California Highway Patrol, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Nicholas Robinson, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Roberta S. Hayashi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoberta S. Hayashi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Harassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: November 18, 2020Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV
Date: October 28, 2020Court Trial: Long Cause
Date: December 07, 2020Declaration: In Support
Date: September 03, 2020Minute Order
Date: October 28, 2020Minute Order
Date: December 09, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 07, 2020 | Hearing |
Court Trial: Long Cause
Judge: Department 10 |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration: Re: Diligence | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order: Restraining Order After Hearing 3-yr/Expires: 12/07/2023 |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration: Non-Service | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Proof of Personal Service |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL'S PETITION FOR WORKPLACE VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDERS |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF GEORGE GORI IN SUPPORT OF CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL'S PETITION FOR WORKPLACE VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER | |
October 28, 2020 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV
Judge: Department 4 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.