Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
United Financial Casualty Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nivinskus, Mark R, against Cruz, Gabriela, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with D. Tyler Tharpe presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeD. Tyler Tharpe Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management371 days |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2020 |
Category22 Limited - Auto Under $10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions232 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a legal document filed by United Financial Casualty Company against Gabriela Cruz. The complaint alleges property damage, personal injury, and wrongful death. The case is filed in the Superior Court of California, County of Fresno. ...
Case Management Statement Filed
Date: July 21, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 17, 2020Dismissal Not Entered
Date: September 02, 2020Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)
Date: March 19, 2020Statement filed
Date: January 14, 2020Civil Complaint filed
Date: January 14, 2020Judgment Received
Date: October 08, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: September 02, 2020Order Denied
Date: October 13, 2020Dismissal Not Entered
Date: October 08, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 04, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: January 05, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: December 24, 2020Dismissal Not Entered
Date: January 05, 2021Judgment Received
Date: January 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support Declaration Filed |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal of Does and Roes Dismissal Not Entered Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Previously Entered |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Court Judgment Judgment Received Forward to: Civil Examiner on 01/08/2021. |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration CCP 585 (d) |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default Request to Enter Default Denied Previously Defaulted |
|
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed Case Management Statement |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Denied Order denying application for default judgment Judge: Cullers, Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.