Case Last Refreshed: 4 hours ago
Brown-Johnson, Shanekka, Hill, Michelle, Orona, Gladys, Robinson, Diamond, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Avetisyan, Narek, against Family Foundations Counseling Services, Heppner, Pearl, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior Court of California, County of Fresno with Tharpe, D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTharpe, D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management127 days |
Filing DateOctober 06, 2020 |
Category36 Unlimited - Wrongful Termination |
|
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California, County of Fresno |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint alleges several violations by the defendants. The plaintiffs, Diamond Robinson, Gladys Orona, and Shanekka Brown-Johnson, claim that the defendant, Family Foundations Counseling Services (FFCS), and its owner/officers have violated var...
Case Management Statement Filed
Date: January 28, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: October 13, 2020Answer Filed
Date: November 19, 2020Proof of Service
Date: October 28, 2020Notice Filed
Date: November 19, 2020Proof of Service
Date: October 26, 2020Amended Document Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Summons issued and filed
Date: October 15, 2020Summons issued and filed
Date: October 08, 2020Civil case cover sheet
Date: October 06, 2020Civil Complaint filed
Date: October 06, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: April 26, 2021Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: October 19, 2021Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed
Date: October 21, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 10, 2021Conditional Settlement Reached
Date: April 16, 2021Notice Filed
Date: February 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Estimated 5-7 days Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
CRC 3.1385 After Settlement
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
48529Requestf0063686 Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
OSC - ADR Stipulation
Judge: Brickey, Gabriel |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
CV-31 Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 3.3185 Notice of Hearing Notice of Dismissal Hearing |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
41815Noticeof00cde04 Conditional Settlement Reached Projected Completion Date: 10/29/21 |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.