Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Brumfield, Dominic, Brumfield, Sallie, Brumfield, Xavier, Guzman, Monica, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bonakdar, Roger S., against Rios, Noemi Elena, Soto, John, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Simpson, Alan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSimpson, Alan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management218 days |
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2020 |
Category22 Unlimited - Auto |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time107 days |
Civil Complaint filed
Date: January 22, 2020Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: May 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review | |
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Notice of Hearing rescheduled hearing from 5/28/2020 to 8/27/2020 at 3:30 pm in Dept. 402 |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed of Sallie Brumfield Judge: Simpson, Alan |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed of Xavier Brumfield Judge: Simpson, Alan |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Guardian Ad Litem Filed of Dominic Brumfield Judge: Simpson, Alan |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed Signed by Clerk |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Civil Complaint filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.