Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Gillaspy Derek Ewing, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank with William D. Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam D. Stewart Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2020 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Filing Court HouseBurbank |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 30, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 30, 2020Petition for Change of Name
Date: September 30, 2020Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: September 30, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED PETITION (1ST)
Date: November 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME)
Date: January 15, 2021Request For Copies
Date: February 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME)
Date: February 05, 2021Decree Changing Name - (AMENDED)
Date: February 05, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by: Derek Ewing Gillaspy (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name; Filed by: Derek Ewing Gillaspy (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Derek Ewing Gillaspy (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition for Change of Name) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Request For Copies; Filed by: Derek Ewing Gillaspy (Petitioner)
Date: February 05, 2021Amended Decree Changing Name; Signed and Filed by: Derek Ewing Gillaspy (Petitioner)
Date: February 05, 2021Petition for Change of Name Filed by Derek Ewing Gillaspy (Petitioner) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) Filed by Derek Ewing Gillaspy (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Derek Ewing Gillaspy (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Petition for Change of Name) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by Derek Ewing Gillaspy (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Request For Copies Filed by Derek Ewing Gillaspy (Petitioner)
Date: February 05, 2021Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Change of Name)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) Filed by Derek Ewing Gillaspy (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Amended Petition for Change of Name (1st) Filed by Derek Ewing Gillaspy (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Change of Name)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Decree Changing Name Filed by Derek Ewing Gillaspy (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Amended Petition for Change of Name (1st)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Change of Name))
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Petition for Change of Name) of 01/15/2021)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.