Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Garcia Elizabeth, Masten Irma, Lor Innovations Llc, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Weeks Bradley T, against Deschene Yolanda, Individually And As Trustee Of The Reyes R. And Maria S. Garcia Restated Revocable Family Trust, Lor Innovations Llc, Oliva Noa, Rodriguez Salvador, (total of 7) See All represented by Hofman Richard, Miller Richard T, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Wendy Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWendy Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2020 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 23, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: December 21, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: January 07, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 23, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 23, 2020Complaint
Date: September 23, 2020Notice of Related Case - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (20AVPB00237)
Date: December 23, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: January 14, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: January 12, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS
Date: January 21, 2021Joinder
Date: January 19, 2021Answer
Date: February 23, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION RICHARD HOFMAN OPP TO EX PARTE
Date: November 16, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 16, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF RICHARD HOFMAN RE OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APP
Date: November 17, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 17, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF GAYLE FENALD RE EX PARTE NOTICE
Date: November 17, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRADLEY T. WEEKS RE EX PARTE NOTICE AND EX PARTE INFORMATION
Date: November 17, 2021Other - - DECLARATION EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RECEIVER
Date: November 17, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER RE RECEIVER
Date: November 17, 2021Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER RE APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER
Date: November 17, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRADLEY T. WEEKS RE TRUSTEE SALE
Date: November 17, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF NOE OLIVA RE LOR RE OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APP
Date: November 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER RE APPOINTMENT OF R...)
Date: November 18, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 23, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO OSC AND APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER
Date: December 03, 2021Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RECEIVER
Date: December 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER RE APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER ; ORDE...)
Date: December 06, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER RE APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER ; ORDE...)
Date: December 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: December 17, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: January 19, 2022Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint
Date: January 04, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF RICHARD HOFMAN IN REPLY TO OPPOSITION
Date: January 21, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: February 01, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 28, 2022Cross-Complaint
Date: February 01, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: February 16, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 04, 2022Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: March 04, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: March 28, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO ANTI-SLAPP MOTION
Date: March 30, 2022Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: April 07, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 07, 2022Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: April 07, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 12, 2022Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ESTABLISHING A BLOCKED ACCOUNT
Date: April 12, 2022Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER
Date: April 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: April 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: June 02, 2022Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: June 02, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: June 03, 2022Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: June 23, 2022Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: June 27, 2022Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: September 07, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY CASE
Date: November 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STAY OF PENDING PROCEEDIN...)
Date: November 15, 2022Notice - NOTICE RE EX PARTE HEARING DATE
Date: November 15, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STAY OF PENDING PROCEEDIN...)
Date: November 22, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: November 28, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: APPEAL)
Date: February 15, 2023Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Opposition to Anti-Slapp Motion; Filed by: LOR Innovations, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Demurrer to Cross Complaint; Filed by: Elizabeth Garcia (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Yolanda Deschene (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint; Filed by: Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Declaration RICHARD HOFMAN OPP TO EX PARTE; Filed by: LOR Innovations, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Yolanda Deschene (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Yolanda Deschene (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Noa Oliva (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer to Complaint; Filed by: Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Declaration of Gayle Fenald Re Ex Parte Notice; Filed by: Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Special Motion to Strike; Filed by: LOR Innovations, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: Noa Oliva (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by: LOR Innovations, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Other - Exhibits in Support of Ex Parte Application for Receiver; Filed by: Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Declaration of Bradley T. Weeks Re Trustee Sale; Filed by: Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion for Receiver; Filed by: Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid paid for respondent Elizabeth Garcia et al; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: LOR Innovations, LLC (Appellant)
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Related Case (20AVPB00237); Filed by: Yolanda Deschene (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal N.O.A. ; B321835; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Declaration of Richard Hofman in Reply to Opposition; Filed by: LOR Innovations, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid Paid for Lor Inovations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint; Filed by: LOR Innovations, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition to Ex Parte Application to Stay Case; Filed by: Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Bradley T. Weeks Re Trustee Sale) Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer) Filed by Noa Oliva (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Other - (Exhibits in Support of Ex Parte Application for Receiver) Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Notice (of Electronic Service Address) Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Gayle Fenald Re Ex Parte Notice) Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff); Irma Masten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to Complaint) Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Related Case ((20AVPB00237)) Filed by Yolanda Deschene (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff); Irma Masten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Receiver) Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order Re Appointment of Receiver) Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Yolanda Deschene (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Noa Oliva (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Re Appointment of R...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Re Appointment of Receiver ; Orde...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff); Irma Masten (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint Filed by LOR Innovations, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Ex Parte Proposed Order (to Continue Trial) Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint) Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order Establishing a Blocked Account) Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by LOR Innovations, LLC (Appellant)
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Notice (Re Ex Parte Hearing Date) Filed by LOR Innovations, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by LOR Innovations, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (N.O.A. ; B321835) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment) Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Stay of Pending Proceedin...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid (Paid for Lor Inovations) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to Cross-Complaint) Filed by LOR Innovations, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by LOR Innovations, LLC (Appellant)
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application to Stay Case) Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer to Cross Complaint) Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Proposed Order Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Opposition (to Anti-Slapp Motion) Filed by LOR Innovations, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid (paid for respondent Elizabeth Garcia et al) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Re Appointment of Receiver ; Orde...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Stay of Pending Proceedin...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Special Motion to Strike) Filed by LOR Innovations, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Elizabeth Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Richard Hofman in Reply to Opposition) Filed by LOR Innovations, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Richard Hofman re Opposition to Ex Parte App)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Re Receiver)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Richard Hofman re Opposition to Ex Parte Application (no ex parte filed))
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Bradley T. Weeks Re Trustee Sale)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order Re Appointment of Receiver)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Other - (Exhibits in Support of Ex Parte Application for Receiver)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Bradley T. Weeks Re Ex Parte Notice and Ex Parte Information)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Gayle Fenald Re Ex Parte Notice)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Notice (of Electronic Service Address)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Related Case ((20AVPB00237))
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Re Appointment of R...))
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Special Motion to Strike)
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) (and for Attorney Fees and Costs)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Noe Oliva Re Lor re Opposition to Ex Parte App)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Receiver)
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint))
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Opposition (to Anti-Slapp Motion)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer to Cross Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order Establishing a Blocked Account)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Opposition (to OSC and Appointment of Receiver)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Richard Hofman in Reply to Opposition)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Re Appointment of Receiver ; Orde...))
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Re Appointment of Receiver ; Orde...))
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Proposed Order
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Establishing a Blocked Account)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Notice (of Electronic Service Address)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Related Case ((20AVPB00237))
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Noe Oliva Re Lor re Opposition to Ex Parte App)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Other - (Exhibits in Support of Ex Parte Application for Receiver)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Bradley T. Weeks Re Trustee Sale)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order Re Appointment of Receiver)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Gayle Fenald Re Ex Parte Notice)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Richard Hofman re Opposition to Ex Parte Application (no ex parte filed))
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Re Receiver)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Richard Hofman re Opposition to Ex Parte App)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Richard Hofman in Reply to Opposition)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Re Appointment of Receiver ; Orde...))
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Bradley T. Weeks Re Ex Parte Notice and Ex Parte Information)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Re Appointment of Receiver ; Orde...))
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Opposition (to OSC and Appointment of Receiver)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Receiver)
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Re Appointment of R...))
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/17/2021)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.