Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fathy Dave, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Kieler Tyler, against Goul Shelley, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Antelope Valley with Brian C. Yep presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseAntelope Valley |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Continuance) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Dave Fathy (Plaintiff); As to: Shelley Goul (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Dave Fathy (Plaintiff); As to: Shelley Goul (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Dave Fathy (Plaintiff); As to: Shelley Goul (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 03, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 06, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 06, 2020Complaint
Date: August 06, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 06, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: CONTINUANCE)
Date: October 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: December 03, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: December 21, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Continuance) of 10/01/2020)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Continuance))
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.