Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Stephens, Carrie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 07, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedJune 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Issued | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Rhynes, Gloria F. |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Returned | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Own Recognizance | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Issued | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Mangar, Jeff |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Returned | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Own Recognizance | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Promise to Appear |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.