Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mau, Susan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nelson, Mark S, Esq., against Caine, Michael, Hampton, Linnie, represented by Mccormick, Barstow, Sheppard, Wayte &Amp; Carruth Llp, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Silveira, Marie Sovey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSilveira, Marie Sovey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 15, 2017 |
CategoryAuto Tort: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Settlement of Entire Case: Unconditional
Date: September 11, 2018Notice of Settlement of Entire Case: Unconditional
Date: September 14, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Silveira, Marie Sovey |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case: Unconditional | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case: Unconditional | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Silveira, Marie Sovey |
|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.