Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Colony Park, Mhc Colony Park Llc, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Contreras, Maria A, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Salter, Timothy W presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2017 |
CategoryInjunctive Relief: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Memorandum of Costs
Date: August 28, 2017Law and Motion Filed
Date: September 08, 2017Civil Complaint
Date: June 16, 2017Reply to Opposition
Date: September 25, 2017Order
Date: August 10, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2027 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition | |
September 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed | |
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons - Personal Service | |
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Disposed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.