Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
filed a(n) Civil Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior with Michael Lief presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2024 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 19, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restrai...) | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to the entire subcase of Amended Amended Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders (1st) filed by Bonnie Mae Burtness on 02/23/2024 | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order CLETS-TEA/TEF (AMENDED) Filed by: Burtness, Bonnie Mae (Petitioner) As to: Francois, Jacob Orion (Respondent) | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing - Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Prevention (AMENDED) Filed by: Burtness, Bonnie Mae (Petitioner) As to: Francois, Jacob Orion (Respondent) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service - Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Prevention Filed by: Burtness, Bonnie Mae (Petitioner) As to: Francoise, Jacob Orion (Respondent) Service Date: 02/23/2024 | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration Re Ex Parte Notice (Amended) Filed by: Burtness, Bonnie Mae (Petitioner) As to: Francois, Jacob Orion (Respondent) | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Amended Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders Filed by: Burtness, Bonnie Mae (Petitioner) As to: Francois, Jacob Orion (Respondent) | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Michael S. Lief in Department 32 Hall of Justice
Judge: Michael Lief |
|
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders scheduled for 03/18/2024 at 01:30 PM in Hall of Justice at Department 32
Judge: Michael Lief |
|
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Updated -- Temporary Restraining Order CLETS-TEA/TEF: Result: Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.