Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
filed a(n) Civil Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior with Michael Lief presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2024 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing CLETS - TEA/TEF Filed by: Salvatore, Charles (Petitioner) As to: Levinson, Jack (Respondent) | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Updated -- Order on Request to Continue Hearing CLETS - TEA/TEF: Result: Granted | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders Filed by: Levenson, Jack (Respondent) | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders scheduled for 04/22/2024 at 01:30 PM in Hall of Justice at Department 32 | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Electronic Service EA116, EA109, EA100, EA120 & EA120 INFO Filed by: Salvatore, Charles (Petitioner) As to: Levinson, Jack (Respondent) Service Date: 03/14/2024 | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders scheduled for 03/11/2024 at 01:30 PM in at Department 32 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion at 04/22/2024 1:30 PM Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders in Department 32 | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restrai...) | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Updated -- Order on Request to Continue Hearing CLETS - TEA/TEF: Result: Granted Expiration: 04/22/2024 Result Date: 03/11/2024 | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing CLETS - TEA/TEF Filed by: Salvatore, Charles (Petitioner) As to: Levinson, Jack (Respondent) Expiration: 04/22/2024 | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service Filed by: Salvatore, Charles (Petitioner) As to: Levinson, Jack (Respondent) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.