Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
filed a(n) Civil Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior with Matthew P. Guasco presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2024 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order (COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION) | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/10/2024 at 08:35 AM in Hall of Justice at Department 20
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/10/2024 at 08:35 AM in at Department 20 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/06/2024
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION)] Generated by: Court | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default scheduled for 07/10/2024 at 08:35 AM in Hall of Justice at Department 20
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment and Mandatory Appearance Generated by: Court | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed by: Ramirez-Pacheco, Juventino (Plaintiff) As to: Bennett Bros Inc (Defendant); Brophy Bros Inc (Defendant) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Matthew P. Guasco in Department 20 Hall of Justice
Judge: Matthew P. Guasco |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: Ramirez-Pacheco, Juventino (Plaintiff) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: Ramirez-Pacheco, Juventino (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.