Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
filed a(n) Civil Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2024 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order (In Re Disqualification of Judge (CCP § 170.6)) | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (In Re Disqualification of Judge (CCP § 170.6)) of 03/01/2024 Filed by: Clerk | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Hall of Justice in Department 40 Reason: | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Reassignment Worksheet Generated by: Court | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Peremptory Challenge to Assigned Judge, Honorable Henry J Walsh; Declaration of Gretchen Carpenter in Support Thereof Filed by: Clay, Jamonte (Plaintiff) | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order (In re Complex & Class Action Designation Review) | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (In re Complex & Class Action Designation Review) of 02/23/2024 Filed by: Clerk | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default scheduled for 06/26/2024 at 08:35 AM in Hall of Justice at Department 42
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment and Mandatory Appearance Generated by: Court | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Updated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.