Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
filed a(n) Civil Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior with Ronda J. McKaig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonda J. McKaig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 29, 2023 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | Updated -- Decree Changing Name: Status Date changed from 11/29/2023 to 01/31/2024 Status changed from Proposed - Received (Hearing Set) to Filed | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | On the Petition for Change of Name filed by Regina Sultana Quddus on 11/29/2023, Order entered as to entire Subcase: (Petition for Change of Name filed by Regina Sultana Quddus on 11/29/2023) | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order (OSC - Name Change) | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication Filed by: Sultana Quddus, Regina (Petitioner) Service Date: 12/16/2023 | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Updated -- Proof of Publication: Service Date: 12/16/2023 | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | OSC - Name Change scheduled for 01/31/2024 at 08:20 AM in Hall of Justice at Department 41 | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment Generated by: Court | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name Filed by: Sultana Quddus, Regina (Petitioner) | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: Sultana Quddus, Regina (Petitioner) | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause for Change of Name Filed by: Sultana Quddus, Regina (Petitioner) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.