Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior with Ronda J. McKaig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonda J. McKaig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 29, 2023 |
CategoryPetition For Decree Releasing Property From Mechanic'S Lien And Order Fixing Date And Time Of Hearing |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeLiens |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition scheduled for 01/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in at Department 41 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/17/2024 | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to the entire subcase of Petition for Decree Releasing Property From Mechanic's Lien and Order Fixing Date and Time of Hearing filed by Brandon Serret, et al. on 11/29/2023 | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Filed by: Serret, Brandon (Petitioner); Serret, Jonathan (Petitioner) | |
January 03, 2024 | Tentative Ruling |
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF VENTURA Tentative Ruling 2023CUMC017150: BRANDON SERRET, et al. vs CALI MASTER BUILDERS 01/03/2024 in Department 41 Petition for Decree Releasing Property From M...
Judge: Ronda J. McKaig |
|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition scheduled for 01/03/2024 at 08:20 AM in at Department 41 Held - Continued at 01/26/2024 8:30 AM Petition for Decree Releasing Property From Mechanic's Lien and Order Fixing Date and Time of Hearing in Department 41 | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Petition for Decree Releasing Property From Mechanic's Lien a...) | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition for Decree Releasing Property From Mechanic's Lien and Order Fixing Date and Time of Hearing scheduled for 01/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Hall of Justice at Department 41 | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Decree Releasing Property From Mechanic's Lien and Order Fixing Date and Time of Hearing scheduled for 01/03/2024 at 08:20 AM in Hall of Justice at Department 41 | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Decree Releasing Property From Mechanic's Lien and Order Fixing Date and Time of Hearing Filed by: Serret, Brandon (Petitioner); Serret, Jonathan (Petitioner) As to: Cali Master Builders (Respondent) | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment Generated by: Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.