Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
filed a(n) Civil Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Superior with Mark S. Borrell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2023 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 13, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement Filed by: FCA US LLC (Defendant) | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Motion to Compel FCA US LLC's Responses to Plaintiff's First ...) | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement Filed by: Cancino Magana, Jonny (Plaintiff); Garza Magana, Maricruz (Plaintiff) | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel FCA US LLC's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Filed by: Cancino Magana, Jonny (Plaintiff); Garza Magana, Maricruz (Plaintiff) | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Compel FCA US LLC's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents: Status Date changed from 02/23/2024 to 02/20/2024 | |
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer Filed by: FCA US LLC (Defendant) | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Cancino Magana, Jonny (Plaintiff); Garza Magana, Maricruz (Plaintiff) As to: FCA US LLC (Defendant) Service Date: 12/06/2023 Service Cost: 40.00 | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default scheduled for 04/11/2024 at 08:35 AM in Hall of Justice at Department 40
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment and Mandatory Appearance Generated by: Court | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.